ND HB1433 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Nodland, Wardner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-24.4-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nursing home rates; to provide an appropriation; to provide legislative intent; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Nodland, Wardner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-24.4-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nursing home rates; to provide an appropriation; to provide legislative intent; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading passed, y 077 n 012 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-01 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-03-24 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-03-20 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-20 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-19 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading passed, y 063 n 028 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 004 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1433.html |