ND 1430 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 20.1-03-11.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licenses to hunt big game without charge and big game hunting licenses for nonresident landowners; and to amend and reenact sections 20.1-03-11 and 20.1-03-11.2, subsection 4 of section 20.1-03-12, and sections 20.1-08-04.2 and 20.1-08-04.6, relating to licenses to hunt big game and governor's proclamations concerning hunting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licenses to hunt big game and governor's proclamations concerning hunting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 93
2019-02-15HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback