ND HB1429 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-03.3-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the compact for a balanced budget.
Title
The compact for a balanced budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] |
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2021-03-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 19 |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |