ND HB1425 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of the responsibility for the funding of nonfederal foster care and subsidized adoption costs.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of the responsibility for the funding of nonfederal foster care and subsidized adoption costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. Alon Wieland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-27 | Second reading, passed, yeas 056 nays 036 | |
2009-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-24 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-15 | Conf comm appointed Erbele Cook Dever | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Weisz Bellew Potter | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-04-08 | Amended on floor | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-04-08 | Amended on floor | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 009 n 005 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-03-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-13 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 004 n 001 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 002 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 010 | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1425.html |