ND HB1422 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the delivery of alcohol to an underage individual; to amend and reenact sections 5-01-09, 5-02-06, and 14-10-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the penalty for delivery of alcohol to an underage individual; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The penalty for delivery of alcohol to an underage individual; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 10 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80 |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |