ND 1420 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subsections to section 19-03.4-02 and chapter 19-24.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the personal use of marijuana; to amend and reenact section 19-03.1-01, subdivision n of subsection 5 of section 19-03.1-05, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-22.2, sections 19-03.1-22.3 and 19-03.1-23, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-23.1, subsection 12 of section 19-03.4-01, sections 19-03.4-03 and 19-03.4-04, subsection 1 of section 39-20-01, section 39-20-14, and subsection 12 of section 65-05-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the legalization of marijuana; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The legalization of marijuana; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
2021-03-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-23SenateReported back amended, without recommendation 5 1 0
2021-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 38
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback