ND 1406 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disability or severe mental illness; to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseSigned by Governor 04/10
2019-04-05HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President
2019-04-02HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2
2019-04-02HouseConcurred
2019-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 0
2019-03-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-02-11SenateReceived from House
2019-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 3
2019-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback