ND HB1405 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
An income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] |
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |