ND 1388 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 10-06.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to persons eligible for corporate farm ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persons eligible for corporate farm ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseSigned by Governor 04/17
2019-04-15HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-12SenateSigned by President
2019-04-05HouseReturned to House
2019-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
2019-04-04SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2019-04-04SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 62 nays 30
2019-02-18HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1
2019-02-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback