ND HB1370 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the property tax exemption for church property; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The property tax exemption for church property; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92 | |
2011-02-15 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 | |
2011-02-14 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1370.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0588-02000.pdf |