ND HB1359 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a study of the efficacy of hyperbaric oxygen therapy; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a study of the efficacy of hyperbaric oxygen therapy; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 91 |
2019-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Lee Anderson K. Roers |
2019-04-05 | House | Conference committee appointed D. Anderson Devlin Schneider |
2019-04-05 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |