ND HB1347 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-15-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to probationary teacher contracts.
Title
Probationary teacher contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 10 |
2019-04-02 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 34 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |