ND 1328 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 54-52.1-04.18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to vitamin D screening and testing; to amend and reenact section 26.1-36.6-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to self-insurance health plans; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-insurance health plans; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 59
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback