ND 1328 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for limitations on the use of an unmanned aerial vehicle for surveillance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for limitations on the use of an unmanned aerial vehicle for surveillance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-16HouseSigned by Governor 04/15
2015-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-13SenateSigned by President
2015-04-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 14
2015-04-09HouseConcurred
2015-04-02HouseReturned to House (12)
2015-04-02SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 29 nays 17
2015-04-02SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-04-01SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2015-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2015-02-25SenateReceived from House
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19
2015-02-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 0
2015-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2015-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback