ND HB1326 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 40-57.1-02 and 40-57.1-03, subsection 4 of section 40-58-20, sections 40-58-20.2 and 40-63-03, subsections 35, 36, and 42 of section 57-02-08, and section 57-02.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval from impacted municipalities for the grant of local property tax incentives.
Title
Approval from impacted municipalities for the grant of local property tax incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57 |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |