ND HB1326 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact six new sections to chapter 19-13.1 and sections 19-13.1-06.1 and 19-13.1-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the manufacturing and distribution of commercial feed; to amend and reenact sections 19-13.1-02, 19-13.1-04, 19-13.1-06, 19-13.1-07, 19-13.1-08, 19-13.1-09, 19-13.1-11, 19-13.1-12, and 19-13.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the manufacturing and distribution of commercial feed; to repeal sections 19-13.1-01, 19-13.1-03, and 19-13.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rules, enforcement, and registration and licensing requirements applicable to commercial feed; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Rules, enforcement, and registration and licensing requirements applicable to commercial feed; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Jessica Haak [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 2 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |