ND HB1322 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 58-18-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to township bonding authority.
Title
Township bonding authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-17 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2017-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 54 nays 32 |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 3 |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee |