ND 1295 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 53-06.1-10.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authorization of sports betting as a game of chance; and to amend and reenact section 53-06.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization of sports betting as a game of chance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorization of sports betting as a game of chance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62
2019-02-18HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2019-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback