ND 1293 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to retail business leases or agreements; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 14-02.4-03 and section 34-06-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to employer's discriminatory practices and one day of rest; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employer's discriminatory practices and one day of rest; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
2019-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-07HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback