ND HB1290 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of search and seizure procedures.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of search and seizure procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 29 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |