ND 1288 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee Hearing 09:30
Pending: Joint Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Mar 8 @ 9:30 am in Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Medicaid coverage of continuous glucose monitoring devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid coverage of continuous glucose monitoring devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 3
2021-02-12HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 18 1 2
2021-02-04HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-04HouseAmendment adopted
2021-02-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback