ND 1278 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 62.1-01-01 and subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-05 relating to the possession of firearms or weapons in government buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 62.1-01-01 and subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-05 relating to the possession of firearms or weapons in government buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
2017-02-20HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 02:45
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback