ND 1257 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the athletic nickname and logo of the university of North Dakota; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The athletic nickname and logo of the university of North Dakota; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-21 Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88
2011-02-17 Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 0 0
2011-01-26 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-01-10 Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback