ND 1254 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 53-06.1-10.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authorization of sports betting as a game of chance; and to amend and reenact sections 53-06.1-03 and 53-06.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization of sports betting as a game of chance and the gaming tax imposed on games of chance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorization of sports betting as a game of chance and the gaming tax imposed on games of chance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 38
2019-03-22SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2019-02-27SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 52 nays 38
2019-02-20HouseReconsidered
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 46 nays 44
2019-02-18HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 7 2
2019-02-07HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-07HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0
2019-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback