ND 1248 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 54 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a prosperity states compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A prosperity states compact.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 1
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-11HouseRereferred to Political Subdivisions
2017-01-11HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback