ND 1245 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 37 of section 12.1-30-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to alcohol establishments open on Sunday; and to repeal section 5-02-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to local Sunday alcoholic beverage permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Sunday alcoholic beverage permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseSigned by Governor 03/13
2017-03-10HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateSigned by President
2017-03-06HouseReturned to House
2017-03-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
2017-03-02SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 1
2017-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
2017-01-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback