ND HB1243 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 28-32-18 and section 54-17-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to administrative rules that would impose a fiscal impact on the oil and gas industry.
Title
Administrative rules that would impose a fiscal impact on the oil and gas industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] |
Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 56 |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |