ND HB1238 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a fee for electric vehicles.
Title
A fee for electric vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 23 |
2019-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |