ND HB1217 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 14-02.5-02 and 47-16-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the rental of a dwelling to a victim of domestic violence.
Title
The rental of a dwelling to a victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. William Kretschmar [R] | Rep. Kris Wallman [D] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2015-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4 |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report rejected |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2015-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Burckhard J. Lee Grabinger |
2015-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Hatlestad Rich S. Becker Oversen |
2015-04-08 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2015-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |