ND 1213 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 19-24.1-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana designated caregivers; to amend and reenact section 19-03.1-01, subsection 5 of section 19-03.1-05, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-22.2, section 19-03.1-22.3, subsections 1, 7, and 9 of section 19-03.1-23, subsection 12 of section 19-03.4-01, sections 19-03.4-03, 19-03.4-04, and 19-24.1-01, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-03, subsection 3 of section 19-24.1-04, sections 19-24.1-10 and 19-24.1-13, paragraph 2 of subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 19-24.1-14, subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 19-24.1-15, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-16, section 19-24.1-17, subsection 4 of section 19-24.1-18, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-20, subsection 3 of section 19-24.1-26, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-37, section 19-24.1-39, and subsection 1 of section 39-20-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the medical marijuana program; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The medical marijuana program; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/30
2021-04-28HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-27SenateSigned by President
2021-04-27SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-04-27SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3
2021-04-27SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-26SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-26HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-19SenateConference committee appointed Lee Anderson K. Roers
2021-04-16HouseConference committee appointed Westlind M. Ruby Beltz
2021-04-16HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-15HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-08HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-08SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3
2021-04-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2021-01-26SenateReceived from House
2021-01-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-21HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback