ND HB1199 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Housing reimbursement for members of the legislative assembly; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Hanson [D] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
Rep. Marie Strinden [D] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Philip Murphy [D] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Signed by Governor 03/26 |
2015-03-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |