ND 1193 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-05-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limits on the use of force and deadly force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits on the use of force and deadly force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 92
2021-02-16HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 0 3
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback