ND 1190 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 14-05-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the valuation date for marital property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The valuation date for marital property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-25SenateSigned by President
2021-03-24HouseReturned to House
2021-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2021-03-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-18SenateReceived from House
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback