ND 1185 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 39-06-09 and 39-08-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to liability for negligence of a minor driver and accident report forms; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liability for negligence of a minor driver and accident report forms; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/12
2021-04-08HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-05SenateSigned by President
2021-04-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-01HouseConcurred
2021-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-24SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-23SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22SenateReceived from House
2021-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2021-02-18HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback