ND HB1179 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-28-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gambling offenses.
Title
Gambling offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 50 |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 2 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |