ND HB1177 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 3 of section 12.1-32-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to probation termination.
Title
Probation termination.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] |
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 41 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53 |
2021-02-10 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |