ND HB1176 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 26.1-13-01, 26.1-13-05, 26.1-13-07, 26.1-13-10, 26.1-13-11, 26.1-13-12, 26.1-13-14, 26.1-13-15, 26.1-13-19, 26.1-13-21, 26.1-13-23, 26.1-13-28, 26.1-13-29, and 26.1-13-34 and subsection 7 of section 26.1-42.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county mutual insurance companies; and to repeal sections 26.1-13-20, 26.1-13-22, 26.1-13-24, 26.1-13-25, 26.1-13-26, 26.1-13-27, 26.1-13-31, 26.1-13-32, and 26.1-13-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county mutual insurance companies.
Title
County mutual insurance companies.
Sponsors
Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2019-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |