ND HB1170 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 58-04-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the removal of township officers; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 44-08-21 and section 58-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the removal of township officers.
Title
The removal of township officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |