ND HB1158 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-12 and a new subsection to section 57-40.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exception to the payment of sales and use taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An exception to the payment of sales and use taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 7 |
2019-02-12 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |