ND HB1153 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 26.1-34-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the interest rate used in determining the minimum nonforfeiture amount for an annuity.
Title
The interest rate used in determining the minimum nonforfeiture amount for an annuity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |