ND HB1138 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT providing for the adoption of an interstate compact entitled "Compact for a Balanced Budget".
Title
AN ACT providing for the adoption of an interstate compact entitled "Compact for a Balanced Budget".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2015-03-31 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 29 nays 17 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 26 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |