ND HB1131 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 36-24-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to adoption of federal meat inspection regulations.
Title
Adoption of federal meat inspection regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Signed by Governor 03/02 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2017-01-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |