ND HB1125 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-27-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to plans for cooperating school districts; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Plans for cooperating school districts; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Jay Fisher [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Kyle Davison [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |