ND HB1119 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 50-06.2-10 and 50-24.7-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to collection of overpayments for service payments for elderly and disabled program and expanded service payments for elderly and disabled program.
Title
Collection of overpayments for service payments for elderly and disabled program and expanded service payments for elderly and disabled program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2017-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-02 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:40 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2017-01-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |