ND HB1104 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
The definition of nonresident and resident student for tuition purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 10 |
2013-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |