ND HB1088 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 61-02-01.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state water commission's comprehensive water development plan; and to repeal section 61-02-01.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to North Dakota outdoor heritage fund grants and their effect on state water commission cost-share amounts.
Title
North Dakota outdoor heritage fund grants and their effect on state water commission cost-share amounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Governor 03/17 |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 12 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |