ND HB1080 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15-05-10 and 47-16-39.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the obligation to pay oil and gas royalties on leases owned and managed by the board of university and school lands.
Title
The obligation to pay oil and gas royalties on leases owned and managed by the board of university and school lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10 |
2021-04-16 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 7 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10 |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-06 | House | Committee Hearing 01:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |