ND HB1052 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 27-20-61 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cooperative agreements to provide services to juveniles adjudicated in tribal court.
Title
Cooperative agreements to provide services to juveniles adjudicated in tribal court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2021-01-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |