ND HB1046 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 4.1-01-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the advisory committee on sustainable agriculture.
Title
The advisory committee on sustainable agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-01-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |