ND HB1043 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 10-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the exemption of an open blockchain token from specified securities transactions and dealings; and to amend and reenact section 10-04-02, subsection 19 of section 13-09-02, and section 13-09-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definitions of an open blockchain token and virtual currency and excluding an open blockchain token and virtual currency from specified money transmission requirements.
Title
The definitions of an open blockchain token and virtual currency and excluding an open blockchain token and virtual currency from specified money transmission requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88 |
2019-01-09 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |